EP1022880 - Multiaccess carrier sensing network communication protocol with priority messages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Echelon Systems Corporation 4015 Miranda Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2000/30] | For all designated states Echelon Systems Corporation 4015 Miranda Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fridich, Marek J. 1086 Strayer Drive San Jose, California 95129 / US | 02 /
Riley, Glen M. 918 Bicknell Road Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 03 /
Dolin, Robert A. Jr. 700 Wallea Drive Menlo Park, California 95025 / US | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2000/30] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99115008.7 | 27.11.1991 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | US19900621737 | 03.12.1990 Original published format: US 621737 | [2000/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022880 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022880 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | [2006/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022880 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/02, G05D23/19, H04L12/40, H04L12/413 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
H04L12/40156 (EP,US);
G05D23/1905 (EP,US);
H04L12/413 (EP,US);
H04L12/40163 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/30] | H04L12/413 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/30] | Title | German: | Protokoll mit Prioritätsnachrichten für ein Kommunikationsnetzwerk mit Mehrfachzugriff und Trägererfassung | [2000/30] | English: | Multiaccess carrier sensing network communication protocol with priority messages | [2000/30] | French: | Protocole de communication de réseau à accès multiple avec détection de porteuse et avec messages prioritaires | [2007/26] |
Former [2000/30] | Protocole de communication de reseau a acces multiple avec detection de la porteuse et avec messages prioritaires | Examination procedure | 24.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 20.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92901462.9 / EP0560886 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4332027 (MALCOLM MICHAEL A, et al) [A] 1,3,4,6 * column 2, line 17 - line 22 * * column 2, line 31 - line 34 *; | [A]US4561092 (SHAVER MICHAEL O [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6 * column 5, line 26 - line 52 * * column 6, line 2 - line 11 * * column 6, line 33 - line 50 * |