Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978273

EP0978273 - Beauty method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 14.02.2007  [2007/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED
5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanida, Masahiro, Shiseido Research Center (1)
1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 223-8553 / JP
02 / Shoji, Ken, Shiseido Research Center (1)
1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 223-8553 / JP
03 / Abe, Tsuneyuki, Shiseido Inst.of Beauty Sciences
9-1 Nishigotanda, 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
04 / Tsukakoshi, Noriko Shiseido Inst.ofBeauty Sciences
9-1 Nishigotanda, 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
05 / Hiroi, Taeko Shiseido Institute of Beauty Sciences
9-1 Nishigotanda, 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
06 / Okuyama, Shogo, Shiseido Co., Ltd.
5-5, Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
07 / Kittaka, Keiko, Shiseido Co., Ltd.
5-5, Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
08 / Tomochika, Kaori
2-5-2, Himebara
Matsuyama-shi, Ehime-ken 791-8012 / JP
[2000/40]
Former [2000/06]01 / Tanida, Masahiro
Shiseido Res. Center, 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 223-8553 / JP
02 / Shoji, Ken
Shiseido Res. Center, 1050 Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 223-8553 / JP
03 / Abe, Tsuneyuki
Shiseido Inst. Beauty Sci., 9-1 Nishigotanda
3-chome, Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
04 / Tsukakoshi, Noriko
Shiseido Inst. Beauty Sci., 9-1 Nishigotanda
3-chome, Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
05 / Hiroi, Taeko
Shiseido Inst. Beauty Sci., 9-1 Nishigotanda
3-chome, Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
06 / Okuyama, Shogo
Shiseido Co., Ltd., 5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
07 / Kittaka, Keiko
Shiseido Co., Ltd., 5-5 Ginza 7-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP
08 / Tomochika, Kaori
2-5-2 Himebara
Matsuyama-shi, Ehime-ken 791-8012 / JP
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus, Weisert & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115021.002.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998023229404.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23229498
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978273
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/46, A61K7/48
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur SCHÖNHEITSPFLEGE[2000/06]
English:Beauty method[2000/06]
French:Procédé de beauté[2000/06]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
26.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.12.2006
10.08.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2007/07]
02.09.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/07]
18.12.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200608   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH05279236  ;
 [A]JPH0525030  ;
 [A]JPH0733641  ;
 [A]JPH09249551  ;
 [A]JPH10194963  ;
 [A]US4582492  (ETTER ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940202), vol. 018, no. 061, Database accession no. (C - 1160), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930614), vol. 017, no. 309, Database accession no. (C - 1070), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, [A] 1 * abstract *