blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0980702


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.03.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  15.05.2002  [2002/20]
06.12.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
04.10.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
24.05.2001 First examination report
18.05.2001 Examination report or reply
14.11.2000 Change - extension states
22.09.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  08.11.2000 [2000/45]
18.08.2000 Request for examination filed published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
07.01.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.02.2000 [2000/08]