blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0980702
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2000063129Global Dossier 29.02.2000A
JP3001522B 24.01.2000B1
Priority number Date
JP24110498 11.08.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0980702Global Dossier 23.02.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP24110498 11.08.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20000017244 25.03.2000A
Priority number Date
JP24110498 11.08.1998