Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980702

EP0980702 - A method of treating exhaust gas and an apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.03.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.2002  [2002/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tsumura, Hiroshi
Advanced Functional Materials Research Center
2-13-1 Isobe, Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
02 / Kawaguchi, Sakae c/o Naoetsu Plant
Shin-Etsu Chem. Co.,Ltd, 28-1 Oaza Nishi-Fukushima
Kubiki-mura, Naka Kubiki-gun, Niigata / JP
03 / Teshigawara, Seiichi
Gunma Complex, Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd.
2-13-1 Isobe, Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
04 / Hirasawa, Hideo
Advanced Functional Materials Research Center
2-13-1 Isobe, Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Wibbelmann, Jobst , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115048.304.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998024110411.08.1998         Original published format: JP 24110498
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980702
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/68
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Abgasen[2000/08]
English:A method of treating exhaust gas and an apparatus therefor[2000/08]
French:Procédé et installation pour le traitement des gaz d'échappement[2000/08]
Examination procedure07.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/20]
10.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3789109  (LYON R, et al) [X] 5,6 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 26 * * column 8, line 28 - line 68; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [Y] 1-4;
 [Y]EP0022172  (DEGUSSA [DE]) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 15; examples 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4304193  (NOELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3582262  (TOMANY JAMES P) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *