Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979876

EP0979876 - Method for producing fermentative product and stress-resistant microorganism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2008
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Ajinomoto Co., Inc.
No. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kikuchi, Yoshimi
Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Ct. Res. Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
02 / Kurahashi, Osamu
Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Fer.&BioLab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Yokozeki, Kenzo
Ajinomoto Co., Inc., AminoSciLab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Tanaka, Takashi
Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Ct.Res.Lab., 1-1 Suzuki-cho
Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115136.611.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022743611.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22743698
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979876
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979876
Date:08.11.2000
[2000/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:C12P1/00, C12P13/04, C12N1/00, C12N1/21, C12N15/00, // (C12P1/00, C12R1:185),(C12P13/04, C12R1:185)
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2001/30]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Produktes mittels Fermentation und Stress-resistenter Mikroorganismus[2000/07]
English:Method for producing fermentative product and stress-resistant microorganism[2000/07]
French:Procédé de préparation d'un produit par fermentation et micro-organisme résistant au stress[2000/07]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure18.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/07]
01.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/08]
07.09.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[YDP]EP0864654  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [YDP] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP0774512  (IMANAKA TADAYUKI [JP]) [YD] 1-8 * claims 1-25 *;
 [AD]EP0488424  (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [AD] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [X]  YAN Z ET AL, "IN VITRO STABILIZATION AND IN VIVO SOLUBILIZATION OF FOREIGN PROTEINS BY THE BETA SUBUNIT OF A CHAPERONIN FROM THE HYPERTHERMOPHILIC ARCHAEON PYROCOCCUS SP. STRAIN KOD1", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON,DC, (19970201), vol. 63, no. 2, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 785 - 789, XP000673019 [X] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [Y]  Y IZAWA ET AL, "Cloning and analysis of the heat shock protein gene from a new hyperthermophilic archaeon, Pyrococcus sp. strain KOD1", EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE,XX,XX, (19940423), XP002029690 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *