Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978515

EP0978515 - 1-(substituted phenyl)-4-biphenylmethyl-imidazol-2-one derivatives, their preparation and their use as angiotensin II antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.07.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.08.2001 [2001/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
G.D. Searle & Co.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
G.D. SEARLE & CO.
P.O. Box 5110
Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Reitz, David B.
14814 Pleasant Ridge Court
Chesterfield, Missouri 63017 / US
02 / Manning, Robert E.
1298 South Mason Road
St. Louis, Missouri 63019 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Beil, Hans Christoph , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Beil, Hans Christoph, Dr. , et al
Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40
65901 Frankfurt / DE
Application number, filing date99115158.008.03.1994
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1993003631624.03.1993         Original published format: US 36316
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978515
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978515
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07D403/10, C07D233/70, A61K31/415
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:1-(substituiertes Phenyl)-4-Biphenylmethyl-imidazol-2-on Derivate, deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung als Angiotensin II Antagonisten[2000/06]
English:1-(substituted phenyl)-4-biphenylmethyl-imidazol-2-one derivatives, their preparation and their use as angiotensin II antagonists[2000/06]
French:Dérivés de 1-(phenyl substitué)-4-biphenylmethyl-imidazol-2-one, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme antagonistes de angiotensin II[2000/06]
Examination procedure18.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/34]
28.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP94912751.8  / EP0690854
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 06
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
20.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200108   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DX]WO9207834  (SEARLE & CO [US]) [DX] 1-5,8,9,17,18,20-22,24-28 * example 4; claims 11,12,14,15,23-29,42,43,45-47 *;
 [A]WO9217469  (SEARLE & CO [US]) [A] 1-5,8,9,17,18,20-22,24-28;
 []EP0508393  (SEARLE & CO [US]) [ ] * page 111 - page 114; examples 32-35 * * claims 12,15,18,21,24,27,43,46,49,52 * * claims 55,58,74,77,80,83,86,89,94-96 *