Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978352

EP0978352 - Eyeglass lens layout device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/06]Eyeglass lens layout device and eyeglass lens processing apparatus having the same
[2003/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2005
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.10.2005  [2005/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho Gamagori-shi
Aichi / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Nidek Co., Ltd.
7-9, Sakae-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizuno, Toshiaki
28-16, Nagane, Kanehira-cho
Gamagori-shi, Aichi / JP
02 / Funakura, Masakazu
481, Kitayama, Oiwa-cho
Toyohashi-shi, Aichi / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Weber, Joachim
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Weber, Joachim, Dr.
Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29
81545 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115266.102.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998021941003.08.1998         Original published format: JP 21941098
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978352
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978352
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978352
Date:03.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B24B9/14
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/51]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brillenglasgestaltungs-Eingabesystem[2003/19]
English:Eyeglass lens layout device[2003/19]
French:Dispositif d'entrée de la topographie d'une lentille ophtalmique[2003/19]
Former [2000/06]Brillenglasgestaltungs-Eingabesystem und Brillenglasbearbeitungsvorrichtung mit diesem System
Former [2000/06]Eyeglass lens layout device and eyeglass lens processing apparatus having the same
Former [2000/06]Dispositif d'entrée de la topographie d'une lentille ophtalmique et système d'usinage de verre de lunettes comprenant ce dispositif
Examination procedure04.09.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
19.03.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2004Fee for grant paid
02.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH02167523  ;
 [A]EP0576268  (HOYA CORP [JP]) [A] 1,9,13 * column A; figure - *;
 [DA]US5347762  (SHIBATA RYOJI [JP], et al) [DA] 1,9,13 * column A *;
 [DA]US5138770  (MATSUYAMA YOSHINORI [JP]) [DA] 1,9,13 * column A *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900914), vol. 014, no. 430, Database accession no. (P - 1106), [X] 1,9,13 * abstract *
by applicantJPH10219410
 US5138770