Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978451

EP0978451 - Packaging machine for food products [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firma Newpack Verpackungssysteme GmbH
Erlenhof 1
49143 Bissendorf / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Lägel, Stephanie
Erlenhof 1
49143 Bissendorf / DE
02 / Schmidt, Horst
Buschstr. 18
58099 Hagen / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Basfeld, Rainer , et al
Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 1580
59705 Arnsberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Basfeld, Rainer, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Mühlenberg 74
59759 Arnsberg / DE
Application number, filing date99115311.503.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813572607.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835726
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978451
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978451
Date:04.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65B25/06, A23B4/048, A23B4/052
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Verpackungsmaschine für Lebensmittel[2000/06]
English:Packaging machine for food products[2000/06]
French:Machine d'emballage pour produits alimentaires[2000/06]
Examination procedure09.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
10.08.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
26.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.10.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.12.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2001Fee for grant paid
30.03.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
LU03.08.2001
BE31.08.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
GR05.10.2001
MC01.03.2002
[2006/39]
Former [2005/01]CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
LU03.08.2001
BE31.08.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
GR05.10.2001
Former [2004/39]CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
LU03.08.2001
BE31.08.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2004/05]CY04.07.2001
FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
BE31.08.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2003/06]FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
BE31.08.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/48]FI04.07.2001
IE04.07.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/27]FI04.07.2001
PT04.10.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/15]FI04.07.2001
SE04.10.2001
Former [2002/05]SE04.10.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]US4414232  (SLEETH RHULE B [US], et al) [A] 1,4,7,17 * column 4, lines 5-14 *;
 [A]US5043174  (LINDNER RICHARD L [US]) [A] 1,4,7,17 * column 4, lines 12-17 *;
 [A]DE2260758  (NORDSEE DEUTSCHE HOCHSEEFISCHE) [A] 1,4-7 * page 5, lines 6-11; figure 3 *
by applicantDE19729766