Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987202

EP0987202 - Pneumatic conveyor with uniform supply of by-pass air [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTAN Materials Handling GmbH
Birkenweg 12
88250 Weingarten / DE
[2002/36]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
Motan-Fuller Verfahrenstechnik GmbH
Birkenweg 12
88250 Weingarten / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Heep, Dieter
Gartenstrasse 34
88368 Bergatreute / DE
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
Application number, filing date99115318.003.08.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateDE199814277318.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19842773
[2000/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987202
Date:22.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0987202
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987202
Date:26.03.2003
Language:DE
[2003/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65G53/16, B65G53/66
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/52]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Pneumatische Fördervorrichtung mit gleichmässiger Lüfteinblasung von Bypass-Luft[2000/15]
English:Pneumatic conveyor with uniform supply of by-pass air[2000/12]
French:Convoyeur pneumatique avec alimentation uniforme en air by-pass[2000/12]
Former [2000/12]Pneumatische Fördervorrichtung mit gleichmässiger Lufteinblasung von Bypass-Luft
Examination procedure02.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
22.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2002Fee for grant paid
08.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB26.03.2003
[2004/22]
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1150320  (PETERS AG CLAUDIUS) [Y] 1-5,8,9,13 * column 1, line 1 - line 7 * * column 2, line 21 - line 23 * * column 3, line 16 - line 24; figure 1 *;
 [YD]EP0603601  (MOTAN VERFAHRENSTECHNIK [DE]) [YD] 1-5,8,9,13 * page 4, line 23 - line 35; figures 1,8 *;
 [Y]US4615648  (MERZ WALTER [CH]) [Y] 13 * column 2, line 7 - line 13 *