Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0986216

EP0986216 - Transmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/11]Tranmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method
[2007/42]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2007/43]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ibaraki, Susumu
Kouryounishimachi 1-6-28-508
Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590-0026 / JP
02 / Hattori, Toshikazu
Kyotofu Kyoto-shi Yamashinaku Otowa Santouchi 40-3
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 607-8065 / JP
03 / Kurosaki, Toshihiko
Nadaku, Takahacho 1-3-3
Kobe-shi, Hyogoken 657-0023 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/11]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99115349.503.08.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateJP1998022004404.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22004498
JP1999020082614.07.1999         Original published format: JP 20082699
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0986216
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0986216
Date:28.08.2002
[2002/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0986216
Date:24.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP10.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/40, H04L12/56
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/21]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Übertragungssystem, Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Bandbreiteverwaltung[2000/11]
English:Transmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method[2007/42]
French:Système de transmission, procédé et dispositif pour la gestion de largeur de bande[2000/11]
Former [2000/11]Tranmission system, bandwidth management apparatus, and bandwidth management method
Examination procedure28.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
03.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2007Fee for grant paid
23.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES04.02.2008
[2008/24]
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9831121  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,13,14,17 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 3 *;
 [A]EP0825784  (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,13,14,17 * column 7, line 17 - line 29 *;
 [Y]US5001707  (KOSITPAIBOON RUNGNOJ [CA], et al) [Y] 4,14,18 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 39 *;
 [Y]WO9631036  (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 4,14,18 * page 5, line 10 - line 21 *;
 [A]US5502714  (SALLBERG KRISTER [SE]) [A] 4,14,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US5748629  (CALDARA STEPHEN A [US], et al) [A] 5,15,19 * abstract *;
 [A]US5477542  (TAKAHARA KEIKO [JP], et al) [A] 11,16,20 * column 2, line 28 - line 50 *
 [A]  - ABRAHAM S P ET AL, "MAX-MIN FAIR RATE CONTROL OF ABR CONNECTIONS WITH NONZERO MCRS", IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. PHOENIX, ARIZONA, NOV. 3 - 8, 1997, GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19971103), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-4199-6, pages 498 - 502, XP000737583 [A] 1,13,17 * abstract *
 [A]  - MARTINI P ET AL, "CONNECTION ORIENTED DATA SERVICE IN DQDB SIMULATION STUDIES OF THE GUARANTEED BANDWIDTH PROTOCOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL PHOENIX CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS. TEMPE, MAR. 23 - 26, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930323), vol. CONF. 12, ISBN 0-7803-0922-7, pages 339 - 345, XP000370498 [A] 1,13,17 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.1993.344444