blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0990605 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0990605



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 93
10.01.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.07.2004 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
28.07.2004 Certificate Search / examination 1
07.07.2004 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.05.2004 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
19.03.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
06.03.2004 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
26.01.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.11.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.11.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
04.11.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
14.08.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
14.08.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
14.08.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
07.05.2003 Description Search / examination 3
07.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.04.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.04.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.03.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
22.03.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
17.12.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.10.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.10.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
09.05.2000 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
11.04.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.03.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
31.03.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
04.08.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
04.08.1999 Description Search / examination 7
04.08.1999 Drawings Search / examination 3
04.08.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6