blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0990605


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.03.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
30.03.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.05.2007  [2007/18]
10.02.2006 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2006  [2006/13]
04.11.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2005  [2005/51]
30.09.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2005  [2005/46]
06.05.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2005  [2005/25]
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
07.01.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  23.02.2005  [2005/08]
03.12.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.01.2005  [2005/03]
12.11.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.12.2004  [2004/53]
20.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.10.2004  [2004/41]
13.08.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.09.2004  [2004/40]
19.01.2004 (Expected) grant published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
14.11.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.11.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.08.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.05.2003 Examination report or reply
23.04.2003 Examination report or reply
27.03.2003 Examination report or reply
13.12.2002 Examination report or reply
13.12.2002 First examination report
16.08.2002 Renewal fee
19.10.2001 Change - applicant published on  05.12.2001 [2001/49]
19.10.2001 Change - representative published on  05.12.2001 [2001/49]
13.08.2001 Renewal fee
27.12.2000 Change - extension states
03.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  20.12.2000 [2000/51]
04.05.2000 Request for examination filed published on  21.06.2000 [2000/25]
14.04.2000 Change - applicant published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
14.04.2000 Change - inventor published on  31.05.2000 [2000/22]
18.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]