blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0990605
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59908702D 08.04.2004D1
Priority number Date
DE19844796 30.09.1998
DE59908702 04.08.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0990605Global Dossier 03.03.2004B1
EP0990605 05.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19844796 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AT260845T 15.03.2004T
Priority number Date
DE19844796 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19844796 30.10.2003C2
DE19844796 13.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19844796 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK0990605T 05.07.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE19844796 30.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2213318T 16.08.2004T3
Priority number Date
DE19844796 30.09.1998