Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990605

EP0990605 - Rail-like transporting track [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Feintool International Holding
Industriering 8
3250 Lyss / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/49]For all designated states
Feintool International Holding
Industriering 3
3250 Lyss / CH
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Bal Tec Holding AG
Obermattstrasse 65
8330 Pfaffikon / CH
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Kumeth, Sigmund
Deinshof 7
92280 Kastl / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kumeth, Sigmund
Deinshof,7
92280 Kastl / DE
[2000/22]
Former [2000/14]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date99115371.904.08.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814479630.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19844796
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990605
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990605
Date:03.03.2004
Language:DE
[2004/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65G27/04, B65G47/14
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Schienenartige Förderstrecke[2000/14]
English:Rail-like transporting track[2000/14]
French:Chemin de transport en forme de rail[2000/14]
Examination procedure19.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
17.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.2003Fee for grant paid
04.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
PT03.08.2004
AT04.08.2004
LU04.08.2004
ES05.08.2004
SE05.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
DK31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]CY03.03.2004
FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
AT04.08.2004
LU04.08.2004
ES05.08.2004
SE05.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
DK31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2006/13]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
AT04.08.2004
SE05.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
DK31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/51]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE05.08.2004
BE31.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
DK31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/46]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE05.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
DK31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/25]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE05.08.2004
CH31.08.2004
LI31.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/23]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
SE05.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/03]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
IE03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
Former [2005/01]FI03.03.2004
GB03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI03.03.2004
GR03.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI03.03.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]US4700827  (HAASER MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1,5,7,12 * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 29 * * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 6; figure - *;
 [X]US5630497  (GRAHAM S NEAL [US]) [X] 1,5,12 * column 7, line 43 - column 9, line 49; figure - *;
 [X]US4732296  (HECK MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,5,7,12 * column W *;
 [A]US3900131  (EHRLICH DON E) [A] 1-3,11 * column W *