Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978388

EP0978388 - Device for drying print [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.02.2006  [2006/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
arsenco ag
Industriezone Schächenwald
6460 Altdorf / CH
[2005/30]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Matti Technology GmbH
Riet 396
8588 Zihlschlacht / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Matti, Max
Riet 396
8588 Zihischlacht / CH
02 / Florin, Christian
Stationsstrasse 29a
6373 Ennetbürgen / CH
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Behrmann, Niels , et al
Behrmann Wagner Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Patentanwälte
Hegau-Tower
Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG)
78224 Singen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Behrmann, Niels, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Heinrich-Weber-Platz 1
78224 Singen / DE
Application number, filing date99115387.504.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813504604.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835046
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978388
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978388
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978388
Date:23.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41J11/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesFI,   FR,   GB [2001/14]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Trocknen von Druckfarbe oder Tinte[2000/06]
English:Device for drying print[2000/06]
French:Dispositif pour faire sècher de l'encre d'impression[2000/06]
Examination procedure15.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/11]
20.01.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.05.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
27.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2004Fee for grant paid
16.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
17.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.02.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001CY   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.02.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200103   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2001
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS54107735  ;
 [A]US5349905  (TAYLOR THOMAS N [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 42 - line 66; figure 2 *;
 [A]JPH08174812  ;
 [A]JPS61209163
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791031), vol. 003, no. 131, Database accession no. (E - 148), [A] 1,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, [A] 1,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870210), vol. 011, no. 044, Database accession no. (M - 560), [A] 12 * abstract *