Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979859

EP0979859 - Working fluid compositions comprising carbon dioxide and a polyester [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 25.11.2009  [2009/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUCHS DEA Schmierstoffe GmbH & Co. KG
Friesenheimer Strasse 17
68169 Mannheim / DE
[2002/19]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
FUCHS DEA Schmierstoff GmbH & Co. KG
Friesenheimer Strasse 17
68169 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Fahl, Jörg
Bertolt-Brecht-Weg 4
31197 Hattorf / DE
02 / Knickmeyer, Rainer
Beim Schlump 23
20144 Hamburg / DE
03 / Dettmann, Peter
Bendestorfer Strass 31a
21244 Buchholz / DE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Schupfner, Gerhard D.
Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Parkstrasse 1
21244 Buchholz / DE
[2009/48]
Former [2000/07]Schupfner, Gerhard D., Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger, Karlstrasse 5
21244 Buchholz / DE
Application number, filing date99115393.304.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE199813522605.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835226
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979859
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979859
Date:08.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10M105/36, C10M171/00, C09K5/04, C10M107/28, // (C10N20/02, 20:04, 40:30)
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Kohlendioxid und einen Polyester enthaltende Kühlarbeitsflüssigkeitzusammensetzungen[2000/07]
English:Working fluid compositions comprising carbon dioxide and a polyester[2000/07]
French:Compositions de fluides de travail comprenant du dioxide de carbon et un polyester[2000/07]
Examination procedure01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
19.04.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2002Fee for grant paid
18.01.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI08.05.2002
GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
AT04.08.2002
LU04.08.2002
PT08.08.2002
SE08.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
CY31.08.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
AT04.08.2002
LU04.08.2002
PT08.08.2002
SE08.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
CY31.08.2002
Former [2004/10]GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
AT04.08.2002
PT08.08.2002
SE08.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
CY31.08.2002
Former [2004/03]GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
AT04.08.2002
PT08.08.2002
SE08.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
Former [2003/51]GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
PT08.08.2002
SE08.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
Former [2003/21]GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
PT08.08.2002
SE08.08.2002
Former [2003/20]GR08.05.2002
IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
SE08.08.2002
Former [2003/17]IE08.05.2002
NL08.05.2002
SE08.08.2002
Former [2003/09]NL08.05.2002
SE08.08.2002
Former [2002/46]SE08.08.2002
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2306497  (ICI PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, lines 5-28 * * page 3, lines 3-6 * * page 3, lines 21-23 *;
 [Y]EP0452509  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * examples 4,5,7-16 * * page 9, column 55 - page 10, column 8 *;
 [Y]EP0568348  (LUBRIZOL CORP [US]) [Y] 1 * example 5 * * page 19, column 56, line 20 - page 20, column 55 *
ExaminationUS5435928