Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978618

EP0978618 - Window or door [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.07.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.09.2004  [2004/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Layer, Klaus
Alte Bahnhofstrasse 45
69168 Wiesloch / DE
For all designated states
Neubauer, Werner, Dr.-Ing.
Am Steinberg 35
65719 Hofheim / DE
For all designated states
Holz, Albert
Katzenbachstrasse 46
73447 Oberkochen / DE
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Meyer-Roedern, Giso
Bergheimer Strasse 10-12
69115 Heidelberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Meyer-Roedern, Giso, Dr.
Bergheimer Strasse 10-12
69115 Heidelberg / DE
Application number, filing date99115395.804.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813556806.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835568
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978618
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978618
Date:16.05.2001
[2001/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/10
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Fenster oder Tür[2000/06]
English:Window or door[2000/06]
French:Fenêtre ou porte[2000/06]
Examination procedure15.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/03]
02.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/37]
05.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
17.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.2002
31.08.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]DE29609354U  (LAYER KLAUS [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE9411505U  (STARK RAIMUND [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]DE8507210U  (SCHILLINGER) [DA] 2,3 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure - *
by applicantDE29609354U
 DE8507210U