Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978764

EP0978764 - Photosensitive resin derived from saponified poly(vinyl acetate), photosensitive resin composition containing the resin, and pattern formation method making use of the composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.05.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.06.2004  [2004/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TOYO GOSEI KOGYO CO., LTD.
1603, Kamimyoden Ichikawa-shi
Chiba 272-0012 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co., Ltd.
1603, Kamimyoden
Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tochizawa, Noriaki, c/o Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co., Ltd.
3805, Hagiwara, Inba-mura
Inba-gun, Chiba 270-1601 / JP
02 / Miyazaki, Mitsuharu, c/o Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co., Ltd.
3805, Hagiwara, Inba-mura
Inba-gun, Chiba 270-1601 / JP
03 / Ito, Takaho, c/o Toyo Gosei Kogyo Co., Ltd.
3805, Hagiwara, Inba-mura
Inba-gun, Chiba 270-1601 / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date99115407.104.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998022211305.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22211398
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978764
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978764
Date:02.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/038, G03F7/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fotoempfindliches Harz auf Basis von verseiftem Polyvinylacetat, dieses Harz enthaltende fotoempfindliche Zusammensetzung, und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mustern unter Verwendung dieser Zusammensetzung[2000/06]
English:Photosensitive resin derived from saponified poly(vinyl acetate), photosensitive resin composition containing the resin, and pattern formation method making use of the composition[2000/06]
French:Résine photosensible à base d'acétate polyvinylique saponifié, composition photosensible contenant cette résine et méthode de fabrication de motifs utilisant cette composition[2000/06]
Examination procedure04.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
28.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
24.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2003Fee for grant paid
25.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0779553  (TOYO GOSEI KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 46 - line 47 *;
 [A]EP0373862  (SERICOL GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * page 4, line 52 - line 54 *;
 [A]EP0252151  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 10, line 1 - line 2 *;
 [A]EP0130804  (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * claim 4 *