Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983938

EP0983938 - Luggage bins for the cabins of passenger aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Deutschland GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2002/06]
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
EADS Airbus GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Airbus Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schumacher, Markus
Gebrüder-Grimm-Weg 30
21614 Buxtehude / DE
02 / Muin, Andrew
Korndistelstrasse 4
21698 Harsefeld / DE
03 / Franke, Lutz
Osterfeldweg 66a
21077 Hamburg / DE
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Hansmann, Dierk
Patentanwälte
Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann
Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99115437.805.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateDE199813970101.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19839701
[2000/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0983938
Date:08.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0983938
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983938
Date:12.05.2004
Language:DE
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:B64D11/00
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/01]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gepäckablageanordnung in einer Flugzeugpassagierkabine[2000/10]
English:Luggage bins for the cabins of passenger aircraft[2000/10]
French:Coffre à bagages pour la cabine d'un avion de passagers[2000/10]
Examination procedure04.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
04.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2004Fee for grant paid
15.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0718189  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1 * column 13, line 14 - line 37; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]DE4130644  (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE4130644