Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004822

EP1004822 - Sliding grate assembly for a solid fuel boiler or a similar installation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HDG Bavaria GmbH Heizkessel & Anlagenbau
Siemensstrasse 6 und 22
84323 Massing / DE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Ackermann, Karl
Brandgasse 1
84323 Massing / DE
02 / Brandl, Konrad
Eggenfeldener Strasse 5
84339 Unterdietfurt / DE
[2000/22]
Representative(s)Hanke, Hilmar
Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08
81609 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]Hanke, Hilmar
Patentanwalt Hanke, Hilmar, Dipl.-Ing. Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing., Leopoldstrasse 77
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115440.205.08.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateDE199815108505.11.1998         Original published format: DE 19851085
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1004822
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004822
Date:13.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F23H7/08, F23L1/02, F23B1/20
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   LI [2001/07]
Former [2000/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schubrostanordnung für einen Festbrennstoff-Kessel o. dgl.[2000/22]
English:Sliding grate assembly for a solid fuel boiler or a similar installation[2000/22]
French:Agencement de grille poussante pour une chaudière à combustible solide ou pour une installation similaire[2000/22]
Examination procedure11.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
09.05.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
23.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
14.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
21.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
14.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2002Fee for grant paid
13.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Opposition(s)14.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US5069146  (DETHIER LOUIS [BE]) [X] 1-3,5 * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]EP0807788  (GEC ALSTHOM STEIN IND [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2312034  (GAFFNEY JOSEPH B) [A] 1,7,8 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US2431799  (GAFFNEY JOSEPH B) [A] 1,7,8 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9518333  (DOIKOS INVESTMENTS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [T]DE29819816U  (HDG BAVARIA GMBH HEIZKESSEL & [DE])