Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980021

EP0980021 - Device and method for exposing image information on light sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.02.2011
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AgfaPhoto GmbH
Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee
51373 Leverkusen / DE
[2005/10]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Agfa-Gevaert Aktiengesellschaft
51373 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Peter
Dianastrasse 9
82110 Germering / DE
[2000/07]
Application number, filing date99115461.805.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE199813633711.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19836337
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980021
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G03B27/73, H04N1/40
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Belichten von Bildinformationen auf lichtempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial[2000/07]
English:Device and method for exposing image information on light sensitive material[2000/07]
French:Appareil et méthode pour l'exposition d'information d'image sur du matériau sensible à la lumière[2000/07]
Examination procedure16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
03.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2005Fee for grant paid
02.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.10.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/13]
08.11.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200507   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2005
31.03.201008   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201009   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201010   M06   Not yet paid
31.03.201011   M06   Not yet paid
31.08.201012   M06   Not yet paid
Stay/Interruption01.04.2010Resumption of proceedings
01.01.2006Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant
[2009/45]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
FR31.08.2006
DE01.03.2007
[2009/30]
Former [2008/44]GB08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
FR31.08.2006
Former [2008/16]GB08.02.2006
IT08.02.2006
Former [2007/18]GB08.02.2006
Documents cited:Search[A]US5170403  (MAYER CHRISTOPHER M [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5036351  (FRICK BEAT [CH], et al) [A] 1,11 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19749925  (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *