blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1001600

EP1001600 - Two piece system for document image capture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2004Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [2000/20]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oliver, Thomas C.
1742 Barnwood Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
[2000/20]
Representative(s)Schoppe, Fritz
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler
Patentanwälte
Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/20]Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing.
Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67
81458 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115481.605.08.1999
[2000/20]
Priority number, dateUS1998018912810.11.1998         Original published format: US 189128
[2000/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1001600
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1001600
Date:28.03.2001
[2001/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2001
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/107
[2000/20]
CPC:
H04N1/00129 (EP,US); H04N1/00127 (EP,US); H04N1/00541 (EP,US);
H04N1/107 (EP,US); H04N1/19594 (EP,US); H04N1/195 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0049 (EP,US); H04N2201/0053 (EP,US); H04N2201/0055 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0074 (EP,US); H04N2201/043 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/02]
Former [2001/51](deleted) 
Former [2000/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zweiteiliges System zur Dokumentbildaufnahme[2000/20]
English:Two piece system for document image capture[2000/20]
French:Système en deux parties pour la capture d'image de document[2000/20]
Examination procedure17.07.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
15.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2004Application withdrawn by applicant  [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DX]US4420773  (TOYODA KENJI [JP], et al) [DX] 1-10 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 43 * * column 20, line 51 - column 23, line 35; figures 19-23 *;
 [X]DE4304506  (SHELDONBERRY COMPUTER TECHNOLO [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,9,10 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0665672  (POLAROID CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * column 3, line 9 - column 3, line 54 ** column 6, line 7 - column 16, line 56 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.