blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0979617

EP0979617 - Bib [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pacimex Verpackungen GmbH
Werkstrasse 9
85298 Scheyern / DE
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / BRINKMANN Fritz
Fichtenweg 4
D-86561 RETTENBACH / DE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Säger, Manfred
Säger & Hofmann Patent AG
Feldgüetliweg 130
8706 Meilen (ZH) / CH
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Säger, Manfred
Säger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei (GbR) Römersteig 2 Postfach 5
7304 Maienfeld / CH
Former [2000/07]Säger, Manfred
Postfach 41
7014 Trin / CH
Application number, filing date99115498.005.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE1998214429U11.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29814429 U
DE1998215326U26.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29815326 U
DE199910117314.01.1999         Original published format: DE 19901173
DE1999207048U20.04.1999         Original published format: DE 29907048 U
DE1999207352U26.04.1999         Original published format: DE 29907352 U
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979617
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A41B13/10
[2000/07]
CPC:
A41B13/10 (EP); A41B2400/52 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Latz[2000/07]
English:Bib[2000/07]
French:Bavoir[2000/07]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/27]
22.12.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/27]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]US3945048  (J. SHEARER) [X] 1-4,8,9 * column 2, line 11 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-4; claims 1,8-11 * [A] 5;
 [X]GB2285570  (N. W. BERNARD BALL) [X] 1-4,9,10 * page 4, paragraph L - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 1-4,12; claims 1,9 *;
 [XPA]US5930837  (B. ANVAR) [XP] 1-4,9 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 2; figures 1-4; claim 1 * [A] 5-7;
 [X]US2782420  (E. D. BARAGER) [X] 1,3,4,8 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 14; figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4186443  (A. BRITZMAN) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 33; figures 1-4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.