Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0951855

EP0951855 - Metering dispenser for soap powder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hirtler GmbH
Beiersdorfstrasse 1
79423 Heitersheim / DE
[1999/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Gallina, Ferenc
Waldkircher Strasse 5
79211 Denzlingen / DE
02 / Staben, Jan Willem
Schladerer Strasse 6
79219 Staufen / DE
[1999/43]
Representative(s)Dinné, Erlend
Beiersdorf AG
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/43]Dinné, Erlend
Beiersdorf AG Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99115573.023.05.1997
[1999/43]
Priority number, dateDE1996209312U24.05.1996         Original published format: DE 29609312 U
DE1996217516U12.10.1996         Original published format: DE 29617516 U
[1999/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0951855
Date:27.10.1999
Language:DE
[1999/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0951855
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47K5/10, A47F1/03, G01F11/34, G01F11/18
[2000/15]
Former International [1999/43]A47K5/10, A47F1/03, G01F11/18, G01F11/34
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/52]
Former [1999/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Dosierspender für Seifenpulver[1999/43]
English:Metering dispenser for soap powder[1999/43]
French:Distributeur-doseur pour poudre de savon[1999/43]
Examination procedure13.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/32]
08.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97924980.2  / EP0900042
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE188400  (KEMPER) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US1993401  (DUDLEY WILLIAM A) [A] 3 * page 2, column L, line 66 - column R, line 29 * * page 3, column L, line 16 - line 32; figures 1,3-7 *;
 [A]US2607514  (KEENE JR ALVIN D);
 [A]US2730271  (DUNN LYMAN D);
 [A]DE445408  (HUGO HELBERGER);
 [A]DE81356  (BECK)