Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978588

EP0978588 - Papermaking belt [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ICHIKAWA CO., LTD.
14-15, Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
ICHIKAWA CO., LTD.
14-15, Hongo 2-chome Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakuma, Norio
8-10, Yatocho 1-chome
Tanashi-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Ikeda, Harushige
3-13, Shimoya 3-chome
Taito-ku, Tokyo / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Meddle, Alan L.
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Meddle, Alan Leonard
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115597.906.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998023657906.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23657998
JP1999012850310.05.1999         Original published format: JP 12850399
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978588
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978588
Date:17.01.2001
[2001/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978588
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:D21F3/02
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Papiermacherband[2000/06]
English:Papermaking belt[2000/06]
French:Bande pour la fabrication du papier[2000/06]
Examination procedure09.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/15]
23.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2003Fee for grant paid
05.12.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.02.2004
CH25.02.2004
CY25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
PT25.07.2004
IE06.08.2004
LU06.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]BE25.02.2004
CH25.02.2004
CY25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
IE06.08.2004
LU06.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/46]BE25.02.2004
CH25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
IE06.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/23]BE25.02.2004
CH25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
MC31.08.2004
Former [2005/02]BE25.02.2004
CH25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
DK25.05.2004
GR25.05.2004
Former [2005/01]BE25.02.2004
CH25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
GR25.05.2004
Former [2004/44]CH25.02.2004
LI25.02.2004
GR25.05.2004
Former [2004/41]GR25.05.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2295832  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4445472  (VOITH SULZER PAPIERMASCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4877472  (RODAL JOSE J A [US])
by applicantJPH01143672U
 JPH01120708U
 JPH057050U
 JPH0642178U
 JPH05311591