blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0978774


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.09.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  15.10.2008  [2008/42]
10.04.2008 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
04.04.2008 First examination report
29.03.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.10.2007 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
09.09.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.09.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.09.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.12.2003 Change - applicant published on  28.01.2004  [2004/05]
12.09.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.09.2002 Renewal fee
11.09.2001 Renewal fee
31.10.2000 Change - extension states
08.09.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  25.10.2000 [2000/43]
11.08.2000 Change - extension states
11.08.2000 Request for examination filed published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
23.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.02.2000 [2000/06]