Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978774

EP0978774 - Process and device for the use of a program-controlled household-machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.09.2008
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2004/05]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Wilsdorf, Gerd
Albrecht-Dürer-Strasse 78
82140 Olching / DE
[2000/06]
Application number, filing date99115607.606.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813592607.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835926
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978774
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/10
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/43]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesSI03.08.2000
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bedienen eines programmgesteuerten Haushaltsgerät[2000/06]
English:Process and device for the use of a program-controlled household-machine[2000/06]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour l'utilisation d'un appareil domestique commandé par programme[2000/06]
Examination procedure03.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
04.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/42]
02.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200709   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19505485  (MIELE & CIE [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0382279  (PHILCO ITALIANA [IT]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS63127307  ;
 [A]JPS6368198
 [XY]  - MIELE& CIE., MIELE-GEBRAUCHSANLEITUNG FÜR WASCHAUTOMAT SUPER ELECTRONIC, Gütersloh,DE, pages 1 - 42, XP002123185 [X] 1-5,7,8,10,12,13 * page 16, column L, paragraph 1 - page 18, column R, paragraph L * [Y] 9
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881013), vol. 012, no. 383, Database accession no. (P - 770), & JP63127307 A 19880531 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 18, Database accession no. 1988-123552, XP002123186 & JPS6368198 A 19880328 (TOSHIBA K.K.) [A] 1,6,11 * abstract *