blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980195

EP0980195 - Household appliance with polyphase connection and with a plurality of electronic power consumers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2008
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Carl-Wery-Strasse 34
81739 München / DE
[2004/05]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH
Hochstrasse 17
81669 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Seehuber, Hans, Dipl.-Ing.
Lohen 14
83324 Ruhpolding / DE
[2000/07]
Application number, filing date99115608.406.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE199813632611.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19836326
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980195
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980195
Date:05.09.2007
[2007/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2007
ClassificationIPC:H05B3/74
[2000/07]
CPC:
H05B1/0266 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2008/20]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Haushaltsgerät mit Mehrphasenanschluss und mit einer Mehrzahl von elektronischen Leistungsverbrauchern[2000/07]
English:Household appliance with polyphase connection and with a plurality of electronic power consumers[2000/07]
French:Appareil électroménager avec connection polyphasée et une pluralité de consommateurs électroniques de puissance[2000/07]
Examination procedure06.03.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/37]
11.04.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2658094  (BUDERUS AG) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE901093  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *;
 [X]US2179781  (FRANKEL EDWARD M, et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.