Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987694

EP0987694 - Optical data recording apparatus, and data recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/12]Optical data recording method, and data recording medium
[2000/26]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2001
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shoji, Mamoru
3-13-4-805, Mozuumemachi
Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8035 / JP
02 / Ishida, Takashi
13-14, Hashimotoisoku
Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8331 / JP
03 / Nakamura, Atsushi
Shokoryo, 25-3, Midocho
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0064 / JP
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99115620.906.07.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateJP1998025990814.09.1998         Original published format: JP 25990898
JP1998035010009.12.1998         Original published format: JP 35010098
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0987694
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987694
Date:20.12.2000
Language:EN
[2000/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/125, G11B20/10, G11B7/00
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/49]
Former [2000/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Optisches Datenaufzeichnungsgerät und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium[2000/26]
English:Optical data recording apparatus, and data recording medium[2000/26]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement optique de données, et support d'enregistrement de données[2000/26]
Former [2000/12]Optisches Datenaufzeichnungsverfahren und Datenaufzeichnungsmedium
Former [2000/12]Optical data recording method, and data recording medium
Former [2000/12]Procédé d'enregistrement optique de données, et support d'enregistrement de données
Examination procedure07.08.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
30.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/12]
25.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.01.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.2000Fee for grant paid
16.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.08.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP99113060.0  / EP0987692
Opposition(s)21.09.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/50]
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2002/10]FR18.05.2001
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP0477892  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,14,15 * column 4, line 7 - line 45 * * column 21, line 10 - column 22, line 6; figures 1,2,20 * [A] 5-13;
 [YA]US5636194  (FURUMIYA SHIGERU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 5-13;
 [A]EP0552936  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0749114  (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *
ExaminationEP0978827