Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978236

EP0978236 - The use of cholesterol-synthesis inhibitors for the reduction of the level of cholesterol in bird eggs [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krämer, Klaus, Dr.
Daniel-Knobloch-Strasse 4
76829 Landau / DE
02 / Baldenius, Kai-Uwe, Dr.
Hannongstrasse 6
67227 Frankenthal / DE
03 / Hoppe, Peter Paul, Dr.med.vet.
Am Hauenstein 13
67157 Wachenheim / DE
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Kinzebach, Werner , et al
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. , et al
Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115698.509.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateDE199813585007.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19835850
[2000/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0978236
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A23K1/16, A61K31/05
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
Extension statesRO28.07.2000
SI28.07.2000
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Hemmstoffen der Cholesterin-Biosynthese zur Senkung des Cholesteringehaltes in Geflügelei[2000/06]
English:The use of cholesterol-synthesis inhibitors for the reduction of the level of cholesterol in bird eggs[2000/06]
French:Utilisation d'inhibiteurs de la biosynthèse du cholestérol pour diminuer la teneur en cholestérol des oeufs de volaille[2000/06]
Examination procedure28.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
20.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
03.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/15]
06.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0543417  (LIPOGENICS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8-12 * page 6, line 29 - line 39 * * page 7, line 22 - line 25 * * page 8, line 50 - line 56 * * page 10, line 40 - line 42 * * page 14, line 22 - line 27 * * examples 8,12 * * claims 2,4,25,26,33 * [Y] 1,2,4-7;
 [XA]US5296508  (PEARCE BRADLEY C [US]) [X] 11 * column 2, line 22 - line 25 * * column 2, line 51 - line 56 * * column 4, line 1 * * tables 1,6 * [A] 4,7;
 [X]US4603142  (BURGER WARREN C [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 1 * * tables 1-4 * * claims 3,4 *;
 [DX]US5217992  (WRIGHT JOHN J [US], et al) [DX] 11 * example 7; table 5 * * claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]  - ELSON, C.E., "Novel Lipids and Cancer, Isoprenoids and Other Phytochemicals", DIETARY FATS, LIPIDS, HORMONES, AND TUMORGENESIS, NEW YORK US, (1996), pages 71 - 86, XP002067388 [Y] 1,2,4-7 * page 71 - page 72; figure 1 *
 [X]  - HOOD, R.L. ET AL., "The Effect of Dietary Monoterpenes on the Cholesterol Level of Eggs", POULTRY SCIENCE, CHAMPAIGN, IL, US, (1978), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 0032-5791, pages 304 - 306, XP000856191 [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10,11 * the whole document *
 [XA]  - YU, S.G., ET AL., "Dietary beta-Ionone Suppresses Hepatic 3-Hydroxy-3-methylglutaryl Coenzyme A Reductase Activity", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (1994), vol. 42, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1493 - 1496, XP002122914 [X] 11 * page 1494; table 1 * * page 1495; table 3 * [A] 4,5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00043a019
 [XA]  - DATABASE BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, XP002122917 [X] 11 * abstract * [A] 4,7
    [] - PEARCE, B.C., ET AL., "Inhibitors of cholesterol biosynthesis.", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY., AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON., US, (1994), vol. 37, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00030a012, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 526 - 541, XP002120203

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00030a012
 [X]  - DATABASE FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, XP002122918 [X] 11 * abstract *
    [] - QURESHI, A.A. ET AL., "Effects of brewers grain and other cereals on lipid metabolism in chickens.", NUTRITION RESEARCH., XX, XX, (1991), vol. 11, no. 2/3, ISSN 0271-5317, pages 159 - 168
 [A]  - DATABASE FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, XP002122919 [A] 7 * abstract *
    [] - SUGIYAMA, K. ET AL., "Isolation of plasma cholesterol-lowering components from ningyotake (Polyporus confluens) mushroom.", JOURNAL OF NUTRITIONAL SCIENCE AND VITAMINOLOGY., ISSN: 0301-4800, (1992), vol. 38, no. 4, pages 335 - 342