Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990489

EP0990489 - Power driven screwdriver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI
published on 29.09.2004  [2004/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. & E. Fein Gmbh & Co. KG
Leuschnerstrasse 41-47
70176 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/52]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
C. & E. FEIN GmbH & Co.
Leuschnerstrasse 41-47
D-70176 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hald, Ewald
Fröbelstrasse 18
70794 Filderstadt / DE
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Gahlert, Stefan , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 105462
70046 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99115725.610.08.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateDE199814502430.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19845024
[2000/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0990489
Date:05.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0990489
Date:10.05.2000
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0990489
Date:03.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:B25B23/14, B25B21/00
[2000/19]
Former International [2000/14]B25B23/14
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/14]
TitleGerman:Kraftgetriebener Schrauber[2000/14]
English:Power driven screwdriver[2000/14]
French:Tournevis motorisé[2000/14]
Examination procedure02.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
30.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.12.2001Fee for grant paid
13.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI03.04.2002
GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
AT10.08.2002
LU10.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
CY31.08.2002
[2004/40]
Former [2004/39]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
AT10.08.2002
LU10.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
CY31.08.2002
Former [2004/10]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
AT10.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
CY31.08.2002
Former [2004/03]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
AT10.08.2002
BE31.08.2002
Former [2003/51]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
BE31.08.2002
Former [2003/46]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
DK03.07.2002
PT03.07.2002
Former [2003/21]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
PT03.07.2002
Former [2003/19]GR03.04.2002
IE03.04.2002
Former [2003/17]IE03.04.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0437060  (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1,4,10 * figure - *;
 [A]US5174424  (ERIKSSON ALF [SE]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * figure 9 *;
 [A]DE3918791  (TIC AG [CH]) [A] 1-4,6-9 * figure 8 *;
 [A]DE2427713  (BLACK & DECKER MFG CO) [A] 10 * page 11, paragraph L - page 12; figures 2-4 *