blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995670


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.10.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.12.2005  [2005/50]
23.09.2005 Change - applicant published on  09.11.2005  [2005/45]
05.11.2004 (Expected) grant published on  22.12.2004  [2004/52]
03.09.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.09.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
03.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.06.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.11.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
11.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.10.2003 Deletion: Reply to examination report
03.10.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.10.2003 Deletion: Fee payment for extension state
01.10.2003 Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state
31.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2003 First examination report
26.06.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
06.06.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  23.07.2003  [2003/30]
29.11.2002 Request for examination filed published on  15.01.2003  [2003/03]
13.09.2002 Publication of search report published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
13.09.2002 Change - classification published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
19.06.2002 Renewal fee
08.06.2001 Renewal fee
02.02.2001 Change - applicant published on  21.03.2001 [2001/12]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]