blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995670
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59911317D 27.01.2005D1
Priority number Date
DE59911317 10.08.1999
DE19848739 22.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995670Global Dossier 22.12.2004B1
EP0995670 30.10.2002A3
EP0995670 26.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19848739 22.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19848739 27.02.2003C2
DE19848739 04.05.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE19848739 22.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2235411T 01.07.2005T3
Priority number Date
DE19848739 22.10.1998