blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0995670

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FI 
 IT 
 NL 
Examination procedure20.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted22.12.2004
Opposition procedure23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 07.12.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:26.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:21.03.2001 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH
 
Event date:30.10.2002 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:30.10.2002 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7B 62D 65/00 A, 7B 62D 25/20 B, 7B 62D 27/06 B, 7B 62D 27/04 B, 7F 16B 5/02 B
 
Event date:30.10.2002 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:15.01.2003 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20021115
 
Event date:23.07.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):DE ES FI IT NL
 
Event date:13.08.2003 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20030701
 
Event date:22.12.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE ES FI IT NL
 
Event date:26.01.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:GERMAN
 
Event date:27.01.2005 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59911317
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20050127
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2235411 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:09.11.2005 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH
 
Event date:14.12.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050923
 
Event date:02.01.2006 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH
Effective DATE:20051109
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20150827
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20150812
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.11.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20150830
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.12.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20150824
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:11.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R084 59911317 DE
Code Expl.: DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160822
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:05.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160901
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160810
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160901
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160810
 
Event date:01.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 59911317 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:31.05.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160811
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20180301
 
Event date:21.11.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20181121