Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995670

EP0995670 - Method in vehicles for the adjustable fastening of parts [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2005
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.12.2005  [2005/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH
Dr.-Hell-Strasse
24107 Kiel / DE
[2005/45]
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH
Falckensteiner Strasse 2
24159 Kiel / DE
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
MaK System Gesellschaft mbH
Falckensteiner Strasse 2
24159 Kiel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kühl, Manfred
Kieler Strasse 11
24229 Schwedeneck / DE
02 / Reker, Alfred
Immelmannstrasse 1
24159 Kiel / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Hansmann, Dierk
Patentanwälte
Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann
Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4
22767 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date99115741.310.08.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814873922.10.1998         Original published format: DE 19848739
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995670
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995670
Date:30.10.2002
[2002/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0995670
Date:22.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B62D65/00, B62D25/20, B62D27/06, B62D27/04, F16B5/02
[2002/44]
Former International [2000/17]B62D65/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FI,   IT,   NL [2003/30]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung für Fahrzeuge zur justierbaren Befestigung von Einbauteilen[2000/17]
English:Method in vehicles for the adjustable fastening of parts[2000/17]
French:Procedé pour véhicule pour la fixation réglable des éléments[2000/17]
Examination procedure15.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
01.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.08.2004Fee for grant paid
20.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE19546703  (PORSCHE AG) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 55; figure 1 * [Y] 2-5;
 [Y]DE4426785  (OPEL ADAM AG) [Y] 2 * figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE9217488U  (OPEL ADAM AG) [Y] 3-5 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3405000  (PHILIPPINE KUNSTSTOFF GMBH) [A] 1-6 * abstract *