Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980052

EP0980052 - Recording medium with electronic ticket definitions recorded thereon and electronic ticket processing methods and apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.05.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.06.2007  [2007/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
[2006/28]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation
3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8116 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fujimura, Ko, c/o Nippon Telegraph and Telephone C
orp., 20-2, Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-1419 / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date99115770.210.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022829312.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22829398
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980052
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980052
Date:31.01.2001
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980052
Date:12.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/10, G07F19/00, G07B15/00, G07F7/08
[2001/05]
Former International [2000/07]G07F7/10, G07F19/00, G07B15/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/42]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungsmedium mit darauf aufgezeichneten elektronischen Ticketdefinitionen und Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Verarbeiten elektronischerTickets[2000/07]
English:Recording medium with electronic ticket definitions recorded thereon and electronic ticket processing methods and apparatuses[2000/07]
French:Support d'enregistrement avec définitions de tickets électroniques enregistrées dedans et méthodes et appareils de traitement de tickets électroniques[2000/07]
Examination procedure10.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/07]
19.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.01.2006
11.01.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
12.01.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
30.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2006Fee for grant paid
18.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]US5754654  (HIROYA MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-105 * figures 1-4; claims 1-5,10-18 *;
 [A]EP0823694  (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 1-105 * page 1, line 5 - line 14 * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 34 - line 54 * * figures 1-3; claims 1,10,15,22-24 *;
 [A]EP0829828  (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 1-105 * column 3, line 15 - line 34 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 37 *;
 [A]GB2317790  (BILLINGSLEY RICHARD [AU]) [A] 1-74 * page 4, line 23 - line 29 * * page 7, line 15 - page 12, line 16 * * claims 1,7-9,20,43-46 *
by applicantUS5621797
 US5557518
 JPH1131204