Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980115

EP0980115 - Electric circuit board with soldered pins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  10.03.2006
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.12.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.01.2007  [2007/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leopold Kostal GmbH & Co. KG
Wiesenstrasse 47
58507 Lüdenscheid / DE
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Hütz, Uwe
Haunerbusch 71
58566 Kierspe / DE
[2000/07]
Application number, filing date99115801.511.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE199813645612.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19836456
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980115
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980115
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980115
Date:16.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/18, H01R12/36, H01R43/02, H01R12/02, H05K3/34, H05K3/00, H01R13/05
[2000/18]
Former International [2000/07]H01R12/18, H01R12/36, H01R43/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Elektrische Leiterplatte mit angelöteten Steckkontaktelementen[2000/07]
English:Electric circuit board with soldered pins[2000/07]
French:Panneau à circuit électrique avec éléments de contact à fiche soudés[2000/07]
Examination procedure08.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
04.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2003Fee for grant paid
22.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.01.2004  18.10.2005  WITHDRAWN
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38 - 50
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Blasberg, Tilo
2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel
Partnerschaft
Schumannstrasse 27
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2005/50]
Opponent(s)01  18.01.2004  18.10.2005  WITHDRAWN
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38 - 50
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Blasberg, Tilo
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft, Corneliusstrasse 18
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [2004/13]
Opponent(s)01  18.01.2004   
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38 - 50
96450 Coburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Blasberg, Tilo, Dr.
2K Patentanwälte, Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft, Corneliusstrasse 18
60635 Frankfurt am Main / DE
27.02.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.06.2004Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.11.2005Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2005
10.11.2005Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.11.2005Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
01.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2006Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2006/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI16.04.2003
IE16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
AT11.08.2003
CY11.08.2003
LU11.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
[2007/04]
Former [2005/11]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
AT11.08.2003
CY11.08.2003
LU11.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
Former [2005/02]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
CY11.08.2003
LU11.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
Former [2004/52]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
CY11.08.2003
LU11.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/39]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
CY11.08.2003
LU11.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/36]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
CY11.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/33]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/23]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
DK16.07.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2004/05]FI16.04.2003
NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2004/02]NL16.04.2003
GR16.07.2003
PT16.07.2003
SE16.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE16.07.2003
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5713126  (SAKEMI SHOJI [JP]) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]EP0557081  (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1-5,7,8 * column 3, lines 52,53 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 10; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [Y]EP0762559  (MOLEX INC [US]) [Y] 1-4 * Zusammenfassung;; figures 1,4 *;
 [Y]FR2700288  (D2 T IND [FR]) [Y] 5 * Zusammenfassung;; figures 1,3 *;
 [Y]US4899920  (ABBAGNARO LOUIS A [US], et al) [Y] 7 * zusammenfassung *;
 [Y]US5590455  (KATO TAKU [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * ganzes Dokument *