Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969069

EP0969069 - Dispensing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bespak plc
Bergen Way North Lynn Industrial Estate King's Lynn
Norfolk PE30 2JJ / GB
[2006/14]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
BESPAK PLC
Bergen Way North Lynn Industrial Estate
King's Lynn Norfolk PE30 2JJ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Thomas, Jonathan
18 Jermyn Road
Gaywood, King's Lynn, Norfolk, PE30 4AE / GB
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Alexander, Thomas Bruce , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam gardens
70, Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Alexander, Thomas Bruce , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date99115821.327.06.1996
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateGB1995001308427.06.1995         Original published format: GB 9513084
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969069
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0969069
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969069
Date:05.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C09K3/10, B65D83/14
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Abgabevorrichtung[2000/01]
English:Dispensing apparatus[2000/01]
French:Dispositif distributeur[2000/01]
Examination procedure11.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
28.07.2003Observations by third parties
25.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
10.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2006Fee for grant paid
01.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96920998.0  / EP0835295
Divisional application(s)EP06006677.6  / EP1681330
Opposition(s)08.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Request for further processing for:19.01.2005Request for further processing filed
19.01.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.02.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
18.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
14.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[DA]WO9502651  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1,4-6 * page 5, line 26 - page 6, line 3 * * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 9 * * claim 1 *;
 [DA]GB2148912  (AEROSOL INVENTIONS DEV) [DA] 1,4 * claims 1-3 *;
 [DA]FR2549568  (AEROSOL INVENTIONS DEV [CH]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]FR2705951  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 7 - line 14 * * page 2, line 21 - line 27 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 6 * * claims 1,6,9 *;
 [A]US4575522  (BREACH WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 4 * * claims 1,16 *;
 [A]US5290539  (MARECKI PAUL E [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 1, line 36 - line 54 * * column 2, line 31 - line 68 * * claims 1,18-20 *;
 [A]WO9503984  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,4;
 [A]WO9425373  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9322221  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * the whole document *
otherDE3332167
    "Die Kohlenstoffgruppe", HOLLEMAN-WIBERG, Lehrbuch der Anorganischen Chemie 91.-100. Auflage, BERLIN, WALTER DE GRUYTER, pages 774 - 775, ISBN 3-11-007511-3, XP002968633
    "Ausrüstung und Verarbeitung von Kunststoffen", HANS-GEORG ELIAS, Makromoleküle - Struktur - Eigenschaften - Synthesen Stoffe, BASEL, HÜTHIG & WEPF VERLAG, pages 359 - 361, ISBN 3-7785-0211-5, XP002968634
    TONY WHELAN, POLYMER TECHNOLOGY DICTIONARY, CHAPMAN & HALL, page 72,429, ISBN 0-412-58180-9, XP002968635