Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0968922

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
CH 
DE 
DK 
ES 
FR 
GB 
GR 
IE 
IT 
LI 
LU 
MC 
NL 
PT 
SE 
Examination procedure22.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.08.2000M01   Fee paid on   04.09.2000
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:698555
Country of Ref Document:EP
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:LT;LV;SI
 
Event date:20.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:02.11.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000904
 
Event date:02.01.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20011114
 
Event date:01.10.2003 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20030311