Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968922

EP0968922 - A packing machine and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG
Cherstrasse 4 Postfach
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
ELOPAK SYSTEMS AG
Cherstrasse 4 Postfach
8152 Glattbrugg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Jackson, Randy D.
1426 Donald
Royal Oak, Michigan 48073 / US
02 / Owen, Barry Charles
28043 Stuart
Southfield, Michigan 48076 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Burrows, Anthony Gregory , et al
Business Centre West
Avenue One, Business Park
Letchworth Garden City, Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Burrows, Anthony Gregory , et al
Business Centre West Avenue One, Business Park
Letchworth Garden City Hertfordshire SG6 2HB / GB
Application number, filing date99115829.618.08.1995
[2000/01]
Priority number, dateUS1994029543225.08.1994         Original published format: US 295432
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968922
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65B43/24, B65B51/14, B31B5/74
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Verpackungsmaschine und Verfahren zum ihren Betrieb[2000/01]
English:A packing machine and method of operating the same[2000/01]
French:Machine d' emballage et procédé pour son fonctionnement[2000/01]
Examination procedure04.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
14.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/40]
22.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/40]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP95305780.9  / EP0698555
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 06
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
17.08.2000M01   Fee paid on   04.09.2000
Documents cited:Search[DXA]GB1036320  (EX CELL O CORP) [DX] 1 * page 3, line 68 - page 5, line 34; figure - * [A] 4;
 [DX]WO8203834  (TETRA PAK INT [SE], et al) [DX] 1 * page 7, line 13 - page 12, line 23; figure - *;
 [DA]US2410587  (MONROE CHARLES Z) [DA] 1,4 * column 5, line 1 - column 7, line 44; figure - *;
 [DA]US2272255  (VERGOBBI JOHN G) [DA] 1,4 * page 2, column 2, line 65 - page 3, column 1, line 45; figure - *
by applicantGB1001596
 US2410587
 US4215522
 US4337059
 US4738077
 US5167607
 GB1036320
 US2272255
 US3166994
 US3398659
 US3943834
 US3999469
 US4519181
 US4589862
 WO8203834