Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979841

EP0979841 - High performance tire tread rubber composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/21]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Blok, Edward John
154 Durling Drive
Wadsworth, Ohio 44281 / US
02 / Sandstrom, Harry Paul
96 Milton Drive
Tallmadge, Ohio 44278 / US
03 / Hsu, Wen-Liang
2034 Bent Creek Trail
Cuyahoga Falls, Ohio 44223 / US
04 / Halasa, Adel Farhan
5040 Everett Road
Bath, Ohio 44333 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Barz, Peter
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/30]Barz, Peter
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Former [2000/07]Barz, Peter
Kaiserplatz 2
80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115840.311.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013350312.08.1998         Original published format: US 133503
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979841
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979841
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08L9/00, C08C19/44, B60C1/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   NL [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kautschukmischung für Lauffläche von Hochleistungsreifen[2000/07]
English:High performance tire tread rubber composition[2000/07]
French:Composition de caoutchouc pour des bandes de roulement de pneumatiques à haute performance[2000/07]
Examination procedure27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
20.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2003Fee for grant paid
12.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Former [2004/23]DE22.08.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0805179  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]JPS58122947  ;
 [A]FR2603592  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 4 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 35, Database accession no. 1983-749786, XP002123031 & JPS58122947 A 19830721 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *