Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979638

EP0979638 - Spinal implant [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dirik, Erkan
Daiberweg 11
70376 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Lucht, Silvia
Geitz Truckenmüller Lucht
Patentanwälte
Werthmannstrasse 15
79098 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Lucht, Silvia
Patentanwälte Geitz, Truckenmüller, Lucht Kaiser-Joseph-Strasse 260
79098 Freiburg / DE
Former [2000/07]Vogler, Silvia
Patentanwälte Schuster & Partner Wiederholdstrasse 10
70174 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date99115874.212.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateDE199813664313.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19836643
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979638
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979638
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979638
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
[2002/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/44, A61B17/80
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Wirbelsäulen-Implantat[2000/07]
English:Spinal implant[2000/07]
French:Implant vertébral[2000/07]
Examination procedure14.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
16.06.2001Request for accelerated examination filed
11.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.09.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
04.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2002Fee for grant paid
13.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI04.12.2002
FR04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
IT04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
AT12.08.2003
CY12.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
[2008/17]
Former [2006/14]FI04.12.2002
FR04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
AT12.08.2003
CY12.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
Former [2005/11]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
AT12.08.2003
CY12.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
Former [2005/02]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY12.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
MC31.08.2003
Former [2004/52]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY12.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/39]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY12.08.2003
LU12.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/36]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CY12.08.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/33]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
CH31.08.2003
LI31.08.2003
Former [2004/22]FI04.12.2002
GB04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/05]FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
ES27.06.2003
Former [2004/02]FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
DK04.03.2003
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/43]FI04.12.2002
GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/42]GR04.12.2002
IE04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/31]GR04.12.2002
NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/30]NL04.12.2002
SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/29]SE04.03.2003
PT05.03.2003
Former [2003/27]SE04.03.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE29703043U  (SIGNUS MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 8 * [Y] 2,3;
 [XAY]WO9715248  (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,6,8,9 * figure 4 * * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 1 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 7;
 [XA]DE29623361U  (MICHELSON GARY K [US]) [X] 1,4,6,9 * figures 14,16,17,20 * * page 14 * * page 25, paragraph 2 - page 27, paragraph 2 * [A] 5;
 [X]FR2742653  (COLORADO [FR]) [X] 1,4,6 * figures 1-4; claims 1,2 *;
 [YA]FR2727005  (EUROS SA [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1-4; claims 1-4,7,10 * [A] 1,4,6,8,9;
 [YA]DE9216092U  (S+G IMPLANTS GMBH) [Y] 7 * figures 1-5; claims 1,2,8,10 * [A] 1,5,6;
 [A]DE29511146U  (OHST NORBERT ING [DE]) [A] 1-4,6 * figures 4-8; claims 1,2,6,9-11,16,18-20 *;
 [A]FR2747034  (SCIENT X [FR]) [A] 1-4,6,8,9 * claims 1-6 * * page 6, line 6 - line 8 *