Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995427

EP0995427 - O/W emulsions containing green tea extract [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dragoco Gerberding & Co Aktiengesellschaft
Dragocostrasse 1
37603 Holzminden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Dragoco Gerberding & Co Aktiengesellschaft
Dragocostrasse 1
D-37603 Holzminden / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Lange, Sabine
Danziger Strasse 20
37603 Holzminden / DE
02 / Pickenhagen, Wilhelm, Dr.
An der Kilianikirche 14
37671 Höxter / DE
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/16]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Former [2000/17]Eikenberg & Stilkenböhmer
Patentanwälte, Schackstrasse 1
30175 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date99115886.612.08.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateDE199814073007.09.1998         Original published format: DE 19840730
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0995427
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0995427
Date:03.05.2000
[2000/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/48
[2000/17]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2001/03]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Grüntee-Extrakt enthaltende O/W-Emulsionen[2000/21]
English:O/W emulsions containing green tea extract[2000/17]
French:Emulsions H/E contenant des extraits de thé vert[2000/17]
Former [2000/17]Grüntee-Extrakt enthantende O/W-Emulsionen
Examination procedure04.11.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/36]
23.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.12.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.12.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.12.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:SearchJPH0881325  [ ] (KOSE CORP);
 [X]JPH02202581  ;
 [X]JPS6115732  ;
 [A]DE3233665  (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 4 - page 6, line 6 *;
 [XY]  - A. TAKAYAMA, "Stable cosmetics containing tea extracts, polyunsaturated fatty acid-containing lipids and oils, and other substances.", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19960708), vol. 125, no. 2, Database accession no. 18653, XP002129405 [X] 1-4,6 * abstract * [Y] 5
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 38, Database accession no. 1990-286992, XP002129407 & JPH02202581 A 19900810 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 10, Database accession no. 1986-064894, XP002129406 & JPS6115732 A 19860123 (POLA KASEI KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract *
 [Y]  - IVANOV, "Untersuchungen über die Haltbarkeit von mit Antioxidationskomplexen stabilisierten kosmetische Cremes.", SEIFEN-ÖLE-FETTE-WACHSE, (1991), vol. 117, no. 14, pages 506 - 508, XP002129404 [Y] 5 * abstract *
 [A]  - IVANOV ST ET AL, "EFFEKTIVE STABILISIERUNG KOSMETISCHER CREMES MIT HILFE VON OPTIMAL ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN UND KONZENTRIERTEN ANTIOXIDATIONS-KOMPLEXEN", SOFW-JOURNAL SEIFEN, OELE, FETTE, WACHSE,DE,VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, H. ZIOLKOWSKY K.G. AUGSBURG, (19920331), vol. 118, no. 5, ISSN 0942-7694, pages 298,300 - 302, XP000262763 [A] 5
 [A]  - The Merck Index, Twelfth Edition, WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, MERCK & CO., INC, (1996), XP002130111 [A] 1-6 * siehe Seite 593 und 594 (3556, 3557, 3558, 3559) *