Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979969

EP0979969 - LED lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stanley Electric Co., Ltd.
2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku
Tokyo 153-8636 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Stanley Electric Co., Ltd.
2-9-13, Nakameguro
Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8636 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kondo, Toshiyuki
2-9-13 Nakameguro, Meguro-ku
Tokyo 153-8638 / JP
02 / Kawaguchi, Yoshifumi
2-9-13 Nakameguro, Meguro-ku
Tokyo 153-8638 / JP
03 / Nomura, Tadashi
2-14-1 Edanishi, Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 225-0014 / JP
04 / Aita, Nobumichi
2-14-1 Edanishi, Aoba-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 225-0014 / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/07]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99115902.112.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022803812.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22803898
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0979969
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0979969
Date:10.10.2001
[2001/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2001
ClassificationInternational:F21K7/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2002/27]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:LED-Lampe[2000/07]
English:LED lamp[2000/07]
French:Lampe à diodes électroluminescentes[2000/07]
Examination procedure11.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/06]
26.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.06.2002DE   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2002FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2002GB   M01   Not yet paid
11.06.2002IT   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
11.06.2002M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4305585  (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 37 * * column 4, line 26 - line 47 * * figures 1-3,5 *;
 [A]US5762414  (MONTALAN DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 8 - line 20 * * column 1, line 38 - line 46 * * column 3, line 13 - line 67 * * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]FR2707222  (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,3,6 * * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 19 * * page 6, line 13 - line 16 * * page 7, line 34 - page 8, line 4 * * page 11, line 2 - line 13 * * claim 1 *;
 [PA]GB2329011  (HOWELLS RAILWAY PRODUCTS LIMIT [GB]) [PA] 1 * page 9, line 17 - page 10, line 23 * * figure 1 *