Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980873

EP0980873 - Binuclear metal hydride complexes and their use as catalysts for the (co)polymerization of polar monomers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - applicantpublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2008/31]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Okuda, Jun, Prof. Dr.
Selztalstrasse 9
55218 Ingelheim / DE
02 / Hultzsch, Kai
Schillerstrasse 40
65207 Wiesbaden / DE
03 / Geprägs, Michael, Dr.
Bubensteig 6
67245 Lambsheim / DE
[2000/08]
Application number, filing date99115955.913.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateDE199813681914.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19836819
[2000/08]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980873
Date:23.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980873
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980873
Date:27.11.2002
Language:DE
[2002/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07F17/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:Binucleare Metallhydridkomplexe und deren Verwendung als Katalysatoren für die (Co)polymerisation von polaren Monomeren[2000/08]
English:Binuclear metal hydride complexes and their use as catalysts for the (co)polymerization of polar monomers[2000/08]
French:Complexes binucléaires à hydrure métallique et leur usage comme catalyseurs pour la (co)polymérisation des monomères polaires[2000/08]
Examination procedure23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
07.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2002Fee for grant paid
16.08.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
DK27.02.2003
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
AT13.08.2003
CY13.08.2003
LU13.08.2003
[2007/18]
Former [2005/11]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
AT13.08.2003
CY13.08.2003
LU13.08.2003
Former [2004/39]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY13.08.2003
LU13.08.2003
Former [2004/36]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
CY13.08.2003
Former [2003/43]FI27.11.2002
GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/42]GR27.11.2002
IE27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/31]GR27.11.2002
PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/29]PT27.02.2003
SE27.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE27.02.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]  SHAPIRO E.J. ET AL, "A Unique Example of a Single-Component Alpha-Olefin Polymerization Catalyst", ORGANOMETALLICS, (1990), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 867 - 869, XP000886403 [X] 1 * page 867, column 1 * * page 868, column 2 * [A] 4-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om00117a055
 [X]  SHAPIRO P.J. ET AL, "Model Ziegler-Natta Alpha-Olefin Polymerization Catalysts derived from ...", J.AM.CHEM.SOC., (1994), vol. 116, no. 11, pages 4623 - 4640, XP000887175 [X] 1 * page 4626, column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 22 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00090a011
 [DXA]  YING MU ET AL, "USE OF ALKANE ELIMINATION IN THE ONE-STEP SYNTHESIS OF ORGANOSCANDIUM COMPLEXES CONTAINING A NEW MULTIDENTATE CYCLOPENTADIENYL LIGAND", ORGANOMETALLICS,US,WASHINGTON, DC, (19960101), vol. 15, no. 14, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 2720 - 2726, XP000612366 [DX] 3 * page 2726, column 1 * * page 2722, column 2, line 17 - line 26 * [X] 3 [A] 4-7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om9600856
Examination   M. Aulbach, F. Küber; "Metallocene-maßgeschneiderte Werkzeuge zur Herstellung von Polyolefinen"; Chemie in unserer Zeit/ 28.Jahrg. 1994/ Nr.4; Seiten 197-208,