Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964399

EP0964399 - Recording defect substitution method, and a recording and reproducing apparatus for a disc-shaped recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [1999/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takagi, Yuji
2-29-1-309, Deguchi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
02 / Nagai, Takahiro, Mezon Higashinoda 301
4-23, Higashinodacho 4-chome, Miyakojima-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 534 / JP
03 / Fukushima, Yoshihisa
C-508, 14, Sekime 6-chome, Joutou-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 557 / JP
04 / Ohara, Shunji
221-5, Shinjou
Higashiosaka-shi, Osaka 578 / JP
05 / Satoh, Isao
36-12, Naritahigashigaoka
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP
[1999/50]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/50]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Martinistrasse 24
28195 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date99116005.218.03.1997
[1999/50]
Priority number, dateJP1996006052418.03.1996         Original published format: JP 6052496
[1999/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0964399
Date:15.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0964399
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0964399
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/12, G11B20/10
[2000/01]
Former International [1999/50]G11B20/18, G11B20/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/50]
TitleGerman:Aufzeichnungsfehler-Ersatzverfahren, und ein Aufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabegerät für ein plattenförmiges Aufzeichnungsmedium[2002/11]
English:Recording defect substitution method, and a recording and reproducing apparatus for a disc-shaped recording medium[1999/50]
French:Procédé de substitution des défauts d'enregistrement, et appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction pour un support d'enregistrement en forme de disque[1999/50]
Former [1999/50]Aufzeichnungsfehler-Ersatzverfahren, und ein Aufzeichnungs-/ und Wiedergabegerät für ein plattenförmiges Aufzeichnungsmedium
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
13.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.10.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.07.2002Fee for grant paid
19.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP97907356.6  / EP0889472
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
02.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0271335  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 11 * * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 24 - line 58 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]JPH03205661  ;
 [A]US4152695  (CARDOT CLAUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 30 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0464811  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 32 * * column 12, line 48 - column 13, line 42 *;
 [PA]WO9627882  (CIRRUS LOGIC INC [US]) [PA] 1,5 * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line 10 *;
 [PA]US5528571  (FUNAHASHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [PA] 1,5 * column 2, line 11 - line 33 * * figures 1,2 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 14 *;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911205), vol. 015, no. 480, Database accession no. (P - 1284), [A] 1,3,5 * abstract *
 [A]  - WATKINSON J R, "Data integrity in disc drives", WIRELESS WORLD, JAN. 1983, UK, ISSN 0043-6062, vol. 89, no. 1564, pages 76 - 78, XP002107355