Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0982831

EP0982831 - Charging arrangement using inductive energy transfer for batteries in a mobile device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
10.08.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Salcomp Oyj
Salorankatu 10
24100 Salo / FI
[2008/14]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Perdix Oy
Eteläranta 8
00130 Helsinki / FI
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH
Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132
75175 Pforzheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Brockmann, Hans-Jürgen
Ullantie 6
25130 Muurla / FI
02 / Turtiainen, Heikki
Haravakujy1
02760 Espoo / FI
[2000/09]
Representative(s)Suominen, Kaisa Liisa , et al
Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy
P.O.Box 99
20521 Turku / FI
[N/P]
Former [2009/22]Suominen, Kaisa Liisa , et al
Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O.Box 99
20521 Turku / FI
Former [2009/20](deleted)
...
Former [2000/15]Brax, Matti Juhani
Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16
00101 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date99116011.014.08.1999
[2000/09]
Priority number, dateDE199813767519.08.1998         Original published format: DE 19837675
[2000/09]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0982831
Date:01.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0982831
Date:07.03.2001
[2001/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982831
Date:05.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP24.01.2001
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/02
[2000/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/48]
Former [2000/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ladevorrichtung für Akkumulatoren in einem mobilen elektrischen Gerät mit induktiver Energieübertragung[2000/09]
English:Charging arrangement using inductive energy transfer for batteries in a mobile device[2000/09]
French:Dispositif de charge à transfert d'énergie par induction pour batterie dans un appareil électrique mobile[2000/09]
Examination procedure19.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
23.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2011Fee for grant paid
15.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2010
Opposition(s)06.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
20.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
20.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
20.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
24.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
19.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT05.10.2011
[2012/37]
Documents cited:Search[PDA]DE19741279  (SALCOMP OY [FI], et al) [PDA] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0533247  (ERICSSON RADIO SYSTEMS BV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, paragraph 4 - column 5, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]EP0535408  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 3; claim 5 *
ExaminationEP0642203
 WO9608068
by applicantDE19741279
 EP0533247
 EP0642203
 WO9608068