Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0959275

EP0959275 - Method of producing a radial shaft sealing ring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2002  [2002/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2002/04]
Former [1999/47]For all designated states
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Reinhardt, Hans
Weinbergstrasse 70
69469 Weinheim / DE
02 / Vogt, Rolf
Planckstädterstrasse 15
68723 Oftersheim / DE
[1999/47]
Application number, filing date99116082.109.03.1996
[1999/47]
Priority number, dateDE199512505410.07.1995         Original published format: DE 19525054
[1999/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0959275
Date:24.11.1999
Language:DE
[1999/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0959275
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/32
[1999/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT,   PT [2000/38]
Former [1999/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Radialwellendichtrings[1999/47]
English:Method of producing a radial shaft sealing ring[1999/47]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un joint radial annulaire pour arbres[1999/47]
Examination procedure17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
09.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/25]
16.11.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/25]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96103706.6  / EP0753690
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
18.01.200003   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2000
18.01.200004   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2000
31.03.200106   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO9408161  (SKF USA INC [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0208314  (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0106585  (T & N MATERIALS RES LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 26 *;
 [A]US5183617  (SAITOH TAKAYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * page 1; figures 1,4,5 *