Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983882

EP0983882 - Arrangement for a pressurised fluid connection especially between a vehicle suspension strut and a pressure supply [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Voss Automotive GmbH
Leiersmühle 2-6
51688 Wipperfürth / DE
[2002/37]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
Armaturenfabrik Hermann Voss GmbH + Co. KG
Leiersmühle 2-6
51688 Wipperfürth / DE
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Armaturenfabrik Hermann Voss GmbH + Co.
Leiersmühle 2-6
51688 Wipperfürth / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Borgmeier, Olav
Hambüchener Weg 2
42499 Hückeswagen / DE
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/37]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
D-42103 Wuppertal / DE
Former [2000/10]Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date99116147.219.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateDE1998215404U27.08.1998         Original published format: DE 29815404 U
[2000/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0983882
Date:08.03.2000
Language:DE
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0983882
Date:30.07.2003
[2003/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983882
Date:26.10.2005
Language:DE
[2005/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/04, B60G17/052
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/17]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Anordnung zur Druckmittel-Verbindung insbesondere eines Fahrzeug-Federbeins mit einer Druckversorgungseinheit[2000/10]
English:Arrangement for a pressurised fluid connection especially between a vehicle suspension strut and a pressure supply[2000/10]
French:Ensemble pour une connection de fluide sous pression en particulier entre une jambe de suspension de véhicule et une source de pression[2000/10]
Examination procedure17.01.2004Examination requested  [2004/13]
31.01.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.05.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2005Fee for grant paid
09.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
09.03.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
09.03.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT26.10.2005
[2008/17]
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0918156  (RENAULT [FR]) [PX] 1 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 11 - line 13 * * column 3, line 17 - line 18 * * column 3, line 46 - line 49 *;
 [A]EP0767080  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0302630  (TUCKER FASTENERS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *